Morson, Barbara Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
locum physician-changes regularly
UOHS
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Slinger-Morson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Slinger ( CPSO# 62264 )
Dr. B. Morson ( CPSO# 62184 )

Business Address:
C H E O
3035 - 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ELIZABETH MORSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1991