Mouaikel, Patricia (CPSO#: 69890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bells Corners Medical Group
15-2006 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 1A5
Phone: (613) 596-0911
Fax: (613) 596-3162
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Mouaikel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mouaikel ( CPSO# 69890 )

Business Address:
Bells Corners Medical Group
Unit 15
2006 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 1A5
Phone Number: (613) 596-0911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MOUAIKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUAIKEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1998