Mouldey, Robert Gordon (CPSO#: 18998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Welkin Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2E 5M5
Phone: (613) 226-8861
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

97 Hinton Ave. North
"Emerging Minds"
Ottawa ON  K1Y 0Z7
Canada
Phone: (613) 728-3808
Fax: (613) 233-9561
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 13, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Gordon
            Mouldey, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mouldey to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ROBERT GORDON MOULDEY
                                          ("Dr. Mouldey")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                                                                                     



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 

                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mouldey, certificate of registration number 18998, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill, and judgment. I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

            (3)   I, Dr. Mouldey, hereby resign from the College effective January 31, 2018
                  (the "Effective Date").

            (4)   I, Dr. Mouldey, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for
                  registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other
                  jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

            (5)   I, Dr. Mouldey, acknowledge and provide consent that in the event that
                  the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking
                  including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied,
                  re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a
                  physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to
                  practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the
                  College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a
                  disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and
                  shall have the right to proceed with the Assessment it terminated as a
                  result of this Undertaking.

            (6)   I, Dr. Mouldey, undertake to the College to abide by the College's Policy
                  on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to
                  Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due
                  to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            (7)   I, Dr. Mouldey, undertake not to accept any new patients prior to the
                  Effective Date.

            (8)   I, Dr. Mouldey, undertake to the College that upon signing this
                  Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the OHIP
                  that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the
                  Effective Date. I acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Mouldey, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Mouldey, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if
                  any, arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Mouldey, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mouldey, consent to this Undertaking being posted on the
                        Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mouldey, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mouldey's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Mouldey has
                              resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or
                              reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any
                              other jurisdiction.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Mouldey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Gordon Mouldey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 13, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mouldey’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Mouldey has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.