Mueller, Elizabeth Katharina (CPSO#: 31281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Stirling MacGregor Dr
Cambridge ON  N1S 5B7
Phone: (519) 622 3434
Fax: (519) 622 7592
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. K. Mueller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mueller ( CPSO# 31281 )

Business Address:
11 George Street South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 740-5060

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 George Street South Cambridge ON N1S 2N3
Instructions: Patients looking to request copies of their medical records can write to the address provided
Date Received: 16 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH KATHARINA MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1998