Mueller, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 72257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland McMaster Family Health Team
555 Prince Charles Drive
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: (905) 734-9699
Fax: (905) 734-3947
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Mueller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mueller ( CPSO# 72257 )

Business Address:
Welland McMaster Family Health Team
555 Prince Charles Drive
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 734-9699

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000