Muir, Erin Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 87126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2153
Fax: (905) 883-2156
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Rutherford Road
Suite 204
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Canada
Phone: (289) 583-0202
Fax: 866-290-0997
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN ANNE ELIZABETH MUIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012