Mukherjee, Som Dave (CPSO#: 77814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 64605
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Som Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mukherjee ( CPSO# 77814 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Oncology
Hamilton Regional Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOM DAVE MUKHERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2003