Mullen, John Brendan Maurice (CPSO#: 33047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
600 University Avenue
6-500-6
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4553
Fax: (416) 586-8719
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

FlowLabs
117 King Street East
West Wing, Second Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 404-5454
Fax: (905) 404-1096
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BRENDAN MAURICE MULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984