Mumford, David Arthur (CPSO#: 59393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Queensway West
Suite 201
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 276-7211
Fax: (905) 276-6486
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Mumford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mumford ( CPSO# 59393 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 276-7211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARTHUR MUMFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1989