Munoz, David Garcia (CPSO#: 52216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: Munoz-Garcia, David (used until: 14 Aug 1991 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Navarra, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint Michael's Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5858
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Munoz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Munoz ( CPSO# 52216 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
30 Bond Street
Room CC 2-907
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5858

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 10 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GARCIA MUNOZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNOZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1989