Murdoch, John Alexander Campbell (CPSO#: 78475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
76 Stuart Street Victory 2
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Murdoch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER CAMPBELL MURDOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURDOCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2008