Murji, Amin (CPSO#: 66740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kitchener-Waterloo Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone: (519) 748-2327
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 745-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Murji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murji ( CPSO# 66740 )

Business Address:
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4

Business Address:
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIN MURJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995