Murphy, Francis Anthony (CPSO#: 29367)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 1 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Valley Family Health Team 95 Spring Street Almonte ON tel:613.256.9370 fax:613.256.0949
Instructions: They are assuming medical care for all of his patients.
Date Received: 21 Aug 2013


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 95 Spring Street Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Date Received: 25 Jul 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013