Murphy, Katherine Joan (CPSO#: 50009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital, 4-F 155,
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 3998
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joan Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Murphy ( CPSO# 50009 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 4F-155
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (416) 346-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE JOAN MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1985