Murtoza, Golam (CPSO#: 77249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 15
630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 1T4
Phone: (905) 793-8868
Fax: (905) 793-8957
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Murtoza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Murtoza ( CPSO# 77249 )

Business Address:
Suite 15
630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 1T4
Phone Number: (905) 793-8868

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Mar 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GOLAM MURTOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTOZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2004 to 08 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2004