Musewe, Norman Nhamu (CPSO#: 52106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Rhodesia, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6633 Highway 7 East
Suite 315
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 471-3700
Fax: (905) 471-3702
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman N. Musewe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Musewe ( CPSO# 52106 )

Business Address:
Suite 315
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 471-3700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN NHAMU MUSEWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSEWE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1989