Myatt, Matthew Francis (CPSO#: 91895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Millpond Medical Centre
106 Victoria St. W.
2nd Floor
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone: (705) 435-0080
Fax: (705) 435-0083
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-5100
Fax: (705) 434-5142
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: 519-941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew F. Myatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Myatt ( CPSO# 91895 )

Business Address:
Millpond Medical Centre
106 Victoria Street West
2nd Floor
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone Number: (705) 435-0080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW FRANCIS MYATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYATT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Aug 2009 to 25 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2011