Myers, Mary Lee (CPSO#: 51144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B6 114
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3479
Fax: (519) 663-3276
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. L. Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Myers ( CPSO# 51144 )

Business Address:
B6 - 114 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3479

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LEE MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1983