Nagji, Noorbegum (CPSO#: 54339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 overlea blvdsuite B6
Toronto
North York ON  M4A 1X1
Phone: (416 ) 696 98
Fax: (416) 696 8080
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji ( CPSO# 54339 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 87583 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 105702)

Business Address:
1880 O'Connor Drive
North York ON  M4A 1W9
Phone Number: (416) 469-0002


Corporation Name: Alim Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji ( CPSO# 54339 )
Dr. R. Bana ( CPSO# 106724)
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 105702)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital Emergency Department
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOORBEGUM NAGJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987