Nahiddi, Negine (CPSO#: 103145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-3008
Fax: (613) 476-6301
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-2181
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Negine Nahiddi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nahiddi ( CPSO# 103145)

Business Address:
35 Bridge Street
Suite 4
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-3008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEGINE NAHIDDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHIDDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2016