Naidu, Rajgopaul (CPSO#: 61149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Level
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone: (416) 778-0101
Fax: (416) 778-4752
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

790 Bay Street
Suite 312
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1L2
Phone: 416-465-5464
Fax: 416-465-0445
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajgopaul Naidu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Dr. R. Naidu ( CPSO# 61149 )

Business Address:
Main Level
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone Number: (416) 778-0101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RAJGOPAUL NAIDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990