Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Naimark, David Malcolm Joseph (CPSO#: 58512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room 386
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 480-4773
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M.J. Naimark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Naimark ( CPSO# 58512 )

Business Address:
1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite 386
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 480-4773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MALCOLM JOSEPH NAIMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIMARK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991