Nair, Vinod Kunhiraman (CPSO#: 70381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Anaesthesiology
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. K. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nair ( CPSO# 70381 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 372-2652

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINOD KUNHIRAMAN NAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007