Najarali, Shamim (CPSO#: 33759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A. and S. Najarali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Najarali ( CPSO# 29631 )
Dr. S. Najarali ( CPSO# 33759 )

Business Address:
100 - 178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone Number: (905) 457-4772

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 7, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shamim Najarali, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Najarali to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SHAMIM NAJARALI
                  
                                          ("Dr. Najarali")
                  
                                                to
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Najarali, certificate of registration number 33759, am a member of
                  the College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the
                  requirement to participate in a program of continuing professional
                  development.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Najarali, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am
                  entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the
                  Continuing Professional Development requirement under section 29 of
                  Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Najarali, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not
                  practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following
                  conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Najarali, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of the OHIP that my billing
                  number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to
                  practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to
                  practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Najarali, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (7)   I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Najarali, undertake to comply with the provisions and conditions
                  of this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision
                  of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct
                  and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee
                  of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Najarali has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario
                        and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice
                        or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Najarali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Najarali, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shamim Najarali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2017:

Dr. Najarali has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.