Nanda, Arvind (CPSO#: 72414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-7956
Fax: (416) 283-4083
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

305 Milner Avenue, suite 920
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arvind Nanda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nanda ( CPSO# 72414 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 283-7956

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARVIND NANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003