Nantha-Aree, Manyat (CPSO#: 79873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Thai

Education:Chiang Mai University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nantha-Aree Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nantha-Aree ( CPSO# 79873 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Thailand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 04 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Manyat Nantha-Aree may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. Nantha-Aree holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Nantha-
                  Aree no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.