Nanthakumar, Kumaraswamy (CPSO#: 69243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
P M C C 3-526b
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4442
Fax: (416) 340-4457
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

IHealth center
Vaughan ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Nanthakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nanthakumar ( CPSO# 69243 )

Business Address:
Northwest GTA Cardiac Program
Vaughan ON  M4C 5M1

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
PMCC 3-526b
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4442

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUMARASWAMY NANTHAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANTHAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999