Naqi, Hadia (CPSO#: 85694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7758
Fax: (888) 830-5340
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadia Naqi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Naqi ( CPSO# 85694 )

Business Address:
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HADIA NAQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 30 Oct 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2007 to 29 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Oct 2007 to 26 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2008