Naqvi, Imran Haider (CPSO#: 85676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Oct 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
112 Queenston Street. Unit M2
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z4
Phone: (905) 397-8875
Fax: (905) 397-7548
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran Naqvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 21 2012


Corporation Name: Dr. Imran Naqvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. I. Naqvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Naqvi ( CPSO# 85676 )

Business Address:
112 Queenston Street
Suite M2
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z4
Phone Number: (905) 397-8875

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Imran Haider Naqvi may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry,
            only.