Naraghi, Ali Mohammad Faghihi (CPSO#: 81445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street Room 3MC421
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581 Ext. 2898
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: A. Naraghi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam ( CPSO# 81573 )
Dr. A. Naraghi ( CPSO# 81445 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3MC421
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Ali Mohammad Faghihi Naraghi may practise medicine independently in
                  diagnostic radiology, only.