Narayan, Shanil Vinode (CPSO#: 73606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
444 Douno Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrain Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Narayan ( CPSO# 73606 )
Dr. S. Mehrain ( CPSO# 74864 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-1990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANIL VINODE NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 21 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004