Nathan, Howard Jack (CPSO#: 25905)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.J. Nathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Health Records Department 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 21 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2018