Nathoo, Ismet Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 28793)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farid M. Shamji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shamji ( CPSO# 33328 )
Dr. I. Nathoo ( CPSO# 28793 )

Business Address:
General Campus - Ottawa Hospital
6NW - Room 6361
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017