Nault, Julie Rachel (CPSO#: 76594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Fax: 613-907-8027
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Boushey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Boushey ( CPSO# 75989 )
Dr. J. Nault ( CPSO# 76594 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montford
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE RACHEL NAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2006