Navaneelan, Gnanapragasam Christy (CPSO#: 61870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 4224
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

525 Nineth Street East
Cornwall ON  K6H 0A3
Canada
Phone: (613) 933-2949
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.C. Navaneelan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Navaneelan ( CPSO# 61870 )

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
Suite E
9th Street East 525
Cornwall ON  K6H 0A3
Phone Number: (613) 933-2949

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GNANAPRAGASAM CHRISTY NAVANEELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAVANEELAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1992