Nawaz, Shah (CPSO#: 27073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208 Caswell Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 2N8
Phone: (705) 522-2682
Fax: (705) 522-3293
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shah Nawaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nawaz ( CPSO# 27073 )

Business Address:
208 Caswell Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 2N8
Phone Number: (705) 522-2682

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAH NAWAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAWAZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1974