Nazerali, Latifa Abdul (CPSO#: 54782)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Nazerali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2017