Needham-Nethercott, Natalie Louise (CPSO#: 68785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2631
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6428
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Needham-Nethercott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Needham-Nethercott ( CPSO# 68785 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999