Neilipovitz, David Thomas (CPSO#: 67747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16405
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Neilipovitz, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 67747 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite F202A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID THOMAS NEILIPOVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEILIPOVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999