Neimanis, Ieva Marija (CPSO#: 31135)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.M. Neimanis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 801 Mohawk Road West Suite 204 Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2017