Neszt, Michael (CPSO#: 95437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Outpatient Mental Health
Floor 5M
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 4759
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Neszt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Neszt ( CPSO# 95437 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Outpatient Mental Health Clinic
5th Floor Morrow Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6486

Business Address:
1700 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4C3
Phone Number: (416) 604-0640

Business Address:
3446 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 604-0640

Business Address:
150 Berry Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 1W3
Phone Number: (416) 231-7070

Business Address:
185 Fifth Street
Toronto ON  M8V 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 252-6471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NESZT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESZT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016