Neumann, Jeffrey Lewis (CPSO#: 61997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 111
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-4747
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Neumann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Neumann ( CPSO# 61997 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
111 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-4747

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
Nova Scotia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY LEWIS NEUMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1991