Neumann, Peter Zsigmond (CPSO#: 17394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Medical Mall
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 111
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-4747
Fax: (416) 438-7224
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

12 Belcourt Rd
Dollard des Ormeaux QC  H9A 1X7
Canada
Phone: (514) 684-1248
Fax: (514) 684-1246
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ZSIGMOND NEUMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUMANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1977