Newell, Paul Robert (CPSO#: 53052)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Newell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jan 2015