Newman, Caroline Gail (CPSO#: 58156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Clair Medical Associates
Suite 401
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 966-0178
Fax: (416) 929-0843
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Newman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015


Corporation Name: Caroline G. Newman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Newman ( CPSO# 58156 )

Business Address:
St. Clair Medical Associates
Suite 401
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (647) 227-3039

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE GAIL NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1988