Newton, Gary Evan (CPSO#: 59525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19-310
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5062
Fax: (416) 586-8787
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Newton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Newton ( CPSO# 59525 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19-310
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY EVAN NEWTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990