Ng, David Kwong Yum (CPSO#: 62182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3920 Dominion Blvd
Windsor ON  N9E2M2
Canada
Phone: (226) 773-6260
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Dept
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Kwong Yum Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng ( CPSO# 62182 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L8
Phone Number: (519) 985-2606

Business Address:
2930 Dominion Boulevard
Windsor ON  N9E 2M2
Phone Number: (226) 773-6260

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KWONG YUM NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991