Ng, David (CPSO#: 68130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
2425 Eglinton Ave East Ste301
Toronto ON  M1K 5G8
Phone: (416) 431-8230
Fax: (416) 759-5162
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7530
Fax: (905) 472-7371
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng ( CPSO# 68130 )

Business Address:
15 Banbury Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2K3
Phone Number: (416) 510-8557

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Mental Health Outpatient Clinic
301 - 2425 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 5G8
Phone Number: (416) 431-8135

Business Address:
Markham - Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7530

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 495-2563

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 379-4668

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996