Ng, Edmund Hui On (CPSO#: 90845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5141
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140


Corporation Name: Edmund Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMUND HUI ON NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015