Ng, Karen Agatha (CPSO#: 87646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8563
Fax: (416) 586-5113
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ng Randall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Randall ( CPSO# 86654 )
Dr. K. Ng ( CPSO# 87646 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 505-4418

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN AGATHA NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2011